TN SB1812 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the Underground Utility Damage Prevention Act, including authorizing the underground utility damage enforcement board to establish, by rule, best practices for uniform color code and marking and adding another member to the board. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 31.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the Underground Utility Damage Prevention Act, including authorizing the underground utility damage enforcement board to establish, by rule, best practices for uniform color code and marking and adding another member to the board. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 31.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 716 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2018 | |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-03-29 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0814) |
2018-03-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0782) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1791 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 716