TN SB1809 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes TRICOR to enter contractual agreements with counties and cities to provide work training programs for prisoners incarcerated in county and city jails. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 22, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes TRICOR to enter contractual agreements with counties and cities to provide work training programs for prisoners incarcerated in county and city jails. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 22, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 705 | |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 6/10/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2120 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 705