TN SB1787 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, classifies as second degree murder the killing of another by unlawful distribution or unlawful delivery or unlawful dispensation of fentanyl or carfentanil, when those substances alone, or in combination with any scheduled controlled substance, including controlled substance analogs, are the proximate cause of the death of the user. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-210.
Title
As enacted, classifies as second degree murder the killing of another by unlawful distribution or unlawful delivery or unlawful dispensation of fentanyl or carfentanil, when those substances alone, or in combination with any scheduled controlled substance, including controlled substance analogs, are the proximate cause of the death of the user. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-210.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 995 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1261) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0749) |
2018-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA1281) |
2018-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1261) |
2018-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0655) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2190 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 995