TN SB1777 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the annual filing fee payable to the secretary of state by certain qualified charitable organizations seeking to solicit contributions in this state. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, revises the annual filing fee payable to the secretary of state by certain qualified charitable organizations seeking to solicit contributions in this state. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 586 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/10/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1828 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 586