TN SB1767 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a student athlete graduation grant fund to provide a source of funding for one-time payments to eligible student athletes who graduate from public four-year postsecondary institutions located in this state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, creates a student athlete graduation grant fund to provide a source of funding for one-time payments to eligible student athletes who graduate from public four-year postsecondary institutions located in this state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Ed. Comm. 3/16/20 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1710 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee