TN HB1710 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a student athlete graduation grant fund to provide a source of funding for one-time payments to eligible student athletes who graduate from public four-year postsecondary institutions located in this state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, creates a student athlete graduation grant fund to provide a source of funding for one-time payments to eligible student athletes who graduate from public four-year postsecondary institutions located in this state. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Higher Education Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1767 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee