TN SB1753 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an agency that promulgates a new permanent rule to identify and repeal two existing permanent rules. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires an agency that promulgates a new permanent rule to identify and repeal two existing permanent rules. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1737 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-07 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee