TN SB1753 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 949
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 949
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a nine-member task force to make recommendations for statutory changes to protect the state's wildlife and waterways against any detrimental effects of invasive Asian carp. - Amends TCA Title 67; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, creates a nine-member task force to make recommendations for statutory changes to protect the state's wildlife and waterways against any detrimental effects of invasive Asian carp. - Amends TCA Title 67; Title 69 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 949 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1821 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 949