TN SB1748 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts taxicab and transportation network company drivers from the prohibition on physically holding a wireless telecommunication device while operating a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 65.
Title
As introduced, exempts taxicab and transportation network company drivers from the prohibition on physically holding a wireless telecommunication device while operating a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 65.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1616 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee