TN SB1740 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a student in any grade kindergarten through three to attend summer school if the student's teacher determines that the student is not academically prepared to advance to the next grade level and that grade retention may benefit the student. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires a student in any grade kindergarten through three to attend summer school if the student's teacher determines that the student is not academically prepared to advance to the next grade level and that grade retention may benefit the student. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1692 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee