TN SB1733 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases, from biennially to annually, the reporting required by the Tennessee maternal mortality review and prevention team to the governor and the general assembly concerning the team's activities and its recommendations for changes to any law, rule, or policy that would promote the safety and well-being of women and prevention of maternal deaths. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, increases, from biennially to annually, the reporting required by the Tennessee maternal mortality review and prevention team to the governor and the general assembly concerning the team's activities and its recommendations for changes to any law, rule, or policy that would promote the safety and well-being of women and prevention of maternal deaths. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 679 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/15/2020 | |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1820 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679