TN HB1820 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases, from biennially to annually, the reporting required by the Tennessee maternal mortality review and prevention team to the governor and the general assembly concerning the team's activities and its recommendations for changes to any law, rule, or policy that would promote the safety and well-being of women and prevention of maternal deaths. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, increases, from biennially to annually, the reporting required by the Tennessee maternal mortality review and prevention team to the governor and the general assembly concerning the team's activities and its recommendations for changes to any law, rule, or policy that would promote the safety and well-being of women and prevention of maternal deaths. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679 | |
2020-06-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Reset on Health Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1733 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 679