TN SB1732 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the proper venue for an order of protection to include the county in which the petitioner resides, regardless of where the domestic abuse, stalking, or sexual assault occurred or whether the respondent is a resident of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, expands the proper venue for an order of protection to include the county in which the petitioner resides, regardless of where the domestic abuse, stalking, or sexual assault occurred or whether the respondent is a resident of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1825 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee