TN HB1825 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the proper venue for an order of protection to include the county in which the petitioner resides, regardless of where the domestic abuse, stalking, or sexual assault occurred or whether the respondent is a resident of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, expands the proper venue for an order of protection to include the county in which the petitioner resides, regardless of where the domestic abuse, stalking, or sexual assault occurred or whether the respondent is a resident of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-26 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1732 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.