OK SB358 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB358
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lindsey Nicole Henry Scholarships for Students with Disabilities Program; removing requirement for prior school year attendance.
Title
Lindsey Nicole Henry Scholarships for Students with Disabilities Program; removing requirement for prior school year attendance.
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Sherrie Conley [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Rep. Neil Hays [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 22 |
2024-04-24 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-04-24 | House | Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order |
2024-04-24 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 57 Nays: 14 |
2024-04-23 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-04-23 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 50 |
2024-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill, Hays |
2024-04-23 | House | General Order |
2024-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules |
2024-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from Common Education Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2023-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Conley |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB358 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Common Education