TN SB1728 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that an amendment to the existing TennCare II waiver be submitted to the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services (CMS) authorizing the bureau of TennCare to create reasonable work and community engagement requirements for able-bodied working age adult enrollees without dependent children under the age of six. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires that an amendment to the existing TennCare II waiver be submitted to the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services (CMS) authorizing the bureau of TennCare to create reasonable work and community engagement requirements for able-bodied working age adult enrollees without dependent children under the age of six. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869 | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1551 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 869