TN HB1551 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that an amendment to the existing TennCare II waiver be submitted to the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services (CMS) authorizing the bureau of TennCare to create reasonable work and community engagement requirements for able-bodied working age adult enrollees without dependent children under the age of six. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires that an amendment to the existing TennCare II waiver be submitted to the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services (CMS) authorizing the bureau of TennCare to create reasonable work and community engagement requirements for able-bodied working age adult enrollees without dependent children under the age of six. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Lay on the Table Amend# 3 by Yarbro (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 8 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Lay on the Table Amend# 3 by Yarbro (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 8 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 869 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 2 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - SA1079) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA0844) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment tabled (Amendment 3 - SA0843) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0842) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0805) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2018-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0695) |
2018-03-19 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 8 - HA0897) |
2018-03-19 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 7 - HA0896) |
2018-03-19 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA0895) |
2018-03-19 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA0894) |
2018-03-19 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0893) |
2018-03-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0892) |
2018-03-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0833) |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1728 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869