TN SB1725 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a 10 percent tax refund on fuel used to operate a sanitation or garbage truck. - Amends TCA Section 67-3-414.
Title
As introduced, establishes a 10 percent tax refund on fuel used to operate a sanitation or garbage truck. - Amends TCA Section 67-3-414.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1760 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee