TN SB1700 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 769
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 769
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, extends the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 769 | |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on Final Calendar of 2020 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Govt Ops Comm. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1778 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 769