TN SB1698 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the requirement that sellers of dogs and cats be licensed to include sellers who sell to individuals and not just sellers who sell at flea markets, who sell for resale, or who sell for research purposes; establishes application and renewal fees of $125 for sellers of dogs and cats who sell to individuals. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, expands the requirement that sellers of dogs and cats be licensed to include sellers who sell to individuals and not just sellers who sell at flea markets, who sell for resale, or who sell for research purposes; establishes application and renewal fees of $125 for sellers of dogs and cats who sell to individuals. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1713 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-21 - Failed in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee