TN SB1698 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 945
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 945
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows Williamson County, upon the adoption of a resolution by a 2/3 majority vote of the county legislative body, to assess a privilege tax on litigation in civil cases in an amount not to exceed $25.00 per case to be used exclusively for personnel and operating costs of the circuit court located in that county; excludes original proceedings brought in juvenile court. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, allows Williamson County, upon the adoption of a resolution by a 2/3 majority vote of the county legislative body, to assess a privilege tax on litigation in civil cases in an amount not to exceed $25.00 per case to be used exclusively for personnel and operating costs of the circuit court located in that county; excludes original proceedings brought in juvenile court. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 945 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 11, PNV 2 |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1081) |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0580) |
2016-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-30 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0586) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/16/2016 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2557 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 945