TN SB1681 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, in cases where a person is ordered into emergency or nonemergency admission to involuntary commitment and is to be released, the chief officer of the releasing facility to notify, by electronic means, local law enforcement prior to such release. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 18; Title 33 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16; Title 18; Title 33 and Title 68, relative to notifications of mental health adjudications and commitments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 10/01/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 656 | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment 1 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 8, PNV 0 |
2024-03-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0695) |
2024-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0532) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/14/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/14/2024 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2061 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 656