TN HB2061 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, in cases where a person is ordered into emergency or nonemergency admission to involuntary commitment and is to be released, the chief officer of the releasing facility to notify, by electronic means, local law enforcement prior to such release. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 18; Title 33 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16; Title 18; Title 33 and Title 68, relative to notifications of mental health adjudications and commitments.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 656 | |
2024-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1681 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2024