TN SB1655 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from $2.00 to $5.00 the authorized maximum amount of archives and record management fee that may be collected by county legislative bodies that have county records commission; authorizes municipalities and towns to collect such fee; extends authorization for collection of the fee through the office of county register and the courts. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10 and Title 68, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, increases from $2.00 to $5.00 the authorized maximum amount of archives and record management fee that may be collected by county legislative bodies that have county records commission; authorizes municipalities and towns to collect such fee; extends authorization for collection of the fee through the office of county register and the courts. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10 and Title 68, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Pub. Ch. 520 | |
2009-07-07 | Effective date(s) 06/25/09 | |
2009-06-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-17 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-06-17 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-15 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-06-12 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | S. Reset on next Message Cal. | |
2009-06-08 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-08 | S. Reset on cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/8/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | S. Reset on cal. for 06/04/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2009 | |
2009-06-01 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 15, PNV 1 | |
2009-06-01 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0677) | |
2009-06-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-05-21 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-05-20 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-05-20 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-20 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0346) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-20 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/27/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/20/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1587 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 520