TN SB1647 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, regulates dispensing of immediate methamphetamine precursor by making it a controlled substance requiring a prescription - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 53, Chapter 11 and Title 63, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, regulates dispensing of immediate methamphetamine precursor by making it a controlled substance requiring a prescription - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 53, Chapter 11 and Title 63, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | S. Reset on S. Regular Calendar for 4/16/14 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. H&W Comm. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1555 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee