TN SB1643 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 610
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 610
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Interstate Driver License Compact." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Interstate Driver License Compact." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 610 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2020 | |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1660 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 610