TN HB1660 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 610
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 610
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Interstate Driver License Compact." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Interstate Driver License Compact." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 610 | |
2020-03-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1643 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 610