TN SB1631 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Failed to pass H., Ayes 38, Nays 45, PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Failed to pass H., Ayes 38, Nays 45, PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a hotel owner or employee from advertising for rent or renting a hotel room for a period of less than seven consecutive hours in a period of 24 hours; authorizes the commissioner of health to assess increasing fines for such rentals and to suspend the owner's permit for a third or subsequent offense. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 14.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a hotel owner or employee from advertising for rent or renting a hotel room for a period of less than seven consecutive hours in a period of 24 hours; authorizes the commissioner of health to assess increasing fines for such rentals and to suspend the owner's permit for a third or subsequent offense. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 14.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 38 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Failed to pass H., Ayes 38, Nays 45, PNV 0 |
2018-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0813) |
2018-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0701) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1704 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.