TN SB1607 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a housing authority may assist in the development of projects that promote affordable rental housing, including mixed-income rental housing developed primarily for persons of low and moderate income as part of its authority to further the goals and local objectives established in redevelopment and urban renewal plans; authorizes the exercise of such powers in the same manner as mixed finance projects for persons of low income. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 20.
Title
As enacted, specifies that a housing authority may assist in the development of projects that promote affordable rental housing, including mixed-income rental housing developed primarily for persons of low and moderate income as part of its authority to further the goals and local objectives established in redevelopment and urban renewal plans; authorizes the exercise of such powers in the same manner as mixed finance projects for persons of low income. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 609 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/25/2020 | |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1654 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 609