TN SB1589 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to award school safety grants to LEAs, public charter schools, private schools, and church-related schools for the purchase of a wearable emergency alert system for teachers and substitute teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1627 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-29 - Withdrawn.