TN HB1627 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to award school safety grants to LEAs, public charter schools, private schools, and church-related schools for the purchase of a wearable emergency alert system for teachers and substitute teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Withdrawn. |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-12-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1589 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee