TN SB1579 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of education to obtain approval from the state board of education for changes to the formula used to calculate school or LEA performance goals and measures; requires the commissioner to convene a working group before submitting a proposal to the state board to change the formula. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 299 | |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1570 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021