TN SB1568 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 1/1/2022
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 1/1/2022
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from 60 to 65 the number of days the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and house of representatives have to comment on draft rules from the department to implement the Tennessee job skills program. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 50; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 50; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 1/1/2022 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1355 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee