TN SB1561 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes Sumner County and municipalities within the county to establish special speed limits in school zones. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-152.
Title
As enacted, authorizes Sumner County and municipalities within the county to establish special speed limits in school zones. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-152.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 534 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/19/2020 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1574 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 534