TN SB1529 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases from $500 to $525 the monthly compensation of the Robertson County highway commissioners and chairman of the commission. - Amends Chapter 380 of the Private Acts of 1947; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 380 of the Private Acts of 1947; as amended by Chapter 20 of the Private Acts of 1969; Chapter 112 of the Private Acts of 1987; Chapter 96 of the Private Acts of 2002; Chapter 64 of the Private Acts of 2008; Chapter 13 of the Private Acts of 2019; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the highway commissioners of Robertson County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 26 | |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1538 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 26