TN SB1524 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes retention requirements for students who did not achieve a certain performance level rating on the English language arts portion of the student's most recent Tennessee comprehensive assessment program test; authorizes an LEA or charter school to retain or promote a student who has not shown a basic understanding of the curriculum and an ability to perform the skills required in the subject of reading, as determined by the LEA or charter school; requires LEAs and charter schools to develop a retention policy for such students and to implement the policy beginning in the 2023-2024 school year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1433 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration