TN SB1505 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allocates all amusement tax revenue generated from an event hosted by a college or university to the college or university to be used exclusively for repairs, maintenance, renovation, enhancements, or debt service on facilities funded with approval of the state school bond authority. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, allocates all amusement tax revenue generated from an event hosted by a college or university to the college or university to be used exclusively for repairs, maintenance, renovation, enhancements, or debt service on facilities funded with approval of the state school bond authority. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with negative recommendation |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1379 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee