TN HB1379 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allocates all amusement tax revenue generated from an event hosted by a college or university to the college or university to be used exclusively for repairs, maintenance, renovation, enhancements, or debt service on facilities funded with approval of the state school bond authority. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, allocates all amusement tax revenue generated from an event hosted by a college or university to the college or university to be used exclusively for repairs, maintenance, renovation, enhancements, or debt service on facilities funded with approval of the state school bond authority. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1505 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee