TN SB1494 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a public institution of higher education from preventing a student athlete from earning compensation as a result of the use of the student athlete's name, image, or likeness; prohibits a public institution of higher education from punishing a student athlete based on a gift, benefit, or inducement given to the student athlete or the student athlete's family by a booster. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1, relative to student athletes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1491 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration