TN SB1482 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a Class C felony of reckless endangerment committed against a population within a geographic territory by members of a criminal gang and the commission of the offense is gang-related; authorizes a court to revoke or prohibit the issuance of a driver license to individuals convicted of such offenses for a five-year period. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to reckless endangerment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02SenateDeferred to Summer Study
2024-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024
2024-04-01SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024
2024-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024
2024-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024
2024-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024
2024-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024
2024-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024
2024-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024
2024-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024
2024-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024
2024-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-02SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0688 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback