TN HB0688 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2024
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2024
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a Class C felony of reckless endangerment committed against a population within a geographic territory by members of a criminal gang and the commission of the offense is gang-related; authorizes a court to revoke or prohibit the issuance of a driver license to individuals convicted of such offenses for a five-year period. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to reckless endangerment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2023-04-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1482 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024