TN SB1470 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an exception to the prohibition on the incorporation of an area within three miles of an existing municipality to allow an area in Hickman County to incorporate; specifies that provisions governing adoption of a charter under the mayor-aldermanic charter provisions of general law do not affect an existing municipality's authority to annex unincorporated areas within the existing municipality's urban growth boundary. - Amends TCA Section 6-1-201.
Title
As enacted, creates an exception to the prohibition on the incorporation of an area within three miles of an existing municipality to allow an area in Hickman County to incorporate; specifies that provisions governing adoption of a charter under the mayor-aldermanic charter provisions of general law do not affect an existing municipality's authority to annex unincorporated areas within the existing municipality's urban growth boundary. - Amends TCA Section 6-1-201.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 760 | |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1473 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 760