TN SB1464 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, decreases the number of required monthly meeting times of the board of mayor and aldermen from two to one. - Amends Chapter 50 of the Private Acts of 1979.
Title
Subject to local approval, decreases the number of required monthly meeting times of the board of mayor and aldermen from two to one. - Amends Chapter 50 of the Private Acts of 1979.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 20 | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1452 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 20