TN SB1464 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 901
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 901
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the allocation and distribution of liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds to local governments for education purposes; creates a legal mechanism whereby a local school board may seek relief in chancery court against a political subdivision that does not make the required distributions of gross receipts liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds; authorizes certain political subdivisions and school systems to negotiate agreements for the local portion of the gross receipts liquor-by-the-drink tax that are owed by the political subdivision to the school system under the distribution formula, as it existed before July 1, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 49; Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the allocation and distribution of liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds to local governments for education purposes; creates a legal mechanism whereby a local school board may seek relief in chancery court against a political subdivision that does not make the required distributions of gross receipts liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds; authorizes certain political subdivisions and school systems to negotiate agreements for the local portion of the gross receipts liquor-by-the-drink tax that are owed by the political subdivision to the school system under the distribution formula, as it existed before July 1, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 49; Title 57 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY Bell (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 901 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 5 - SA1186) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA1185) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA1184) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0912) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1182) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1403 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 901