TN SB1447 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to submit a state anti-poverty plan by January 15 every odd-numbered year beginning in 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to submit a state anti-poverty plan by January 15 every odd-numbered year beginning in 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1399 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.