TN SB1447 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, amends the town charter generally relative to non-resident voting rights; the vice mayor's appointment date; notice requirements for special meetings of the board of mayor and aldermen; the procedure for adopting ordinances and resolutions; the borrowing of money; the duties, compensation, and benefits of town officers; and the duties and powers of the municipal judge. - Amends Chapter 70 of the Acts of 1907; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, amends the town charter generally relative to non-resident voting rights; the vice mayor's appointment date; notice requirements for special meetings of the board of mayor and aldermen; the procedure for adopting ordinances and resolutions; the borrowing of money; the duties, compensation, and benefits of town officers; and the duties and powers of the municipal judge. - Amends Chapter 70 of the Acts of 1907; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 34 | |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1437 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Pr. Ch. 34