TN HB1437 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pr. Ch. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pr. Ch. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, amends the town charter generally relative to non-resident voting rights; the vice mayor's appointment date; notice requirements for special meetings of the board of mayor and aldermen; the procedure for adopting ordinances and resolutions; the borrowing of money; the duties, compensation, and benefits of town officers; and the duties and powers of the municipal judge. - Amends Chapter 70 of the Acts of 1907; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, amends the town charter generally relative to non-resident voting rights; the vice mayor's appointment date; notice requirements for special meetings of the board of mayor and aldermen; the procedure for adopting ordinances and resolutions; the borrowing of money; the duties, compensation, and benefits of town officers; and the duties and powers of the municipal judge. - Amends Chapter 70 of the Acts of 1907; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Doss [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Pr. Ch. 34 | |
2018-03-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-04-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1447 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 34