TN SB1447 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1032
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1032
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the statute of limitations for prosecution of the offenses of aggravated child abuse, or aggravated child neglect or endangerment. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the statute of limitations for prosecution of the offenses of aggravated child abuse, or aggravated child neglect or endangerment. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 1032 | |
2016-05-05 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0743) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on message calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0743) |
2016-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-03 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0585) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2016 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/26/2016 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/26/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1645 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1032