TN HB1645 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1032
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1032
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the statute of limitations for prosecution of the offenses of aggravated child abuse, or aggravated child neglect or endangerment. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the statute of limitations for prosecution of the offenses of aggravated child abuse, or aggravated child neglect or endangerment. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1032 | |
2016-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1447 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1032
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1645&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1645.pdf |