TN SB1443 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a student's parent or legal guardian, or the student if the student has reached the age of majority, to provide certain consent before the student may engage in certain activities at school. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 68, relative to consent in educational events.
Sponsors
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. Brent Taylor [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-17 | Pub. Ch. 353 | |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 24, PNV 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0431) |
2023-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0470) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0464) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0316) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0727 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 353